Dr Rajendra Prasad (1884-1963) |
26 January 1950-13 May 1962 |
Dr Sarvepalli Radhakrishnan (1888-1975) |
13 May 1962-13 May 1967 |
Dr Zakir Hussain (1897-1969) |
13 May 1967-3 May 1969 |
Varahagiri Venkatagiri (1884-1980) (Acting) |
3 May 1969-20 July 1969 |
Justice Mohammad Hidayatullah (1905-1992) (Acting) |
20 July 1969-24 August 1969 |
Varahagiri Venkatagiri (1884-1980) |
24 August 1969-24 August 1974 |
Fakhruddin Ali Ahmed (1905-1977) |
24 August 1974-11 February 1977 |
B.D. Jatti (1913-2002) (Acting) |
11 February 1977-25 July 1977 |
Neelam Sanjiva Reddy (1913-1996) |
25 July 1977-25 July 1982 |
Giani Zail Singh (1916-1994) |
25 July 1982-25 July 1987 |
R. Venkataraman (1910-2009) |
25 July 1987-25 July 1992 |
Dr Shankar Dayal Sharma (1918-1999) |
25 July 1992-25 July 1997 |
K.R. Narayanan (1920-2005) |
25 July 1997-25 July 2002 |
Dr. A.P.J. Abdul Kalam (Birth-1931) |
25 July 2002-25 July 2007 |
Smt. Pratibha Devisingh Patil (Birth-1934) |
25 July 2007 - 25 July 2012 |
Shri Pranab Mukherjee (Birth-1935) |
25 July 2012 - Incumbent |