Jawaharlal Nehru (1889-1964) |
15 August 1947-27 May 1964 |
Gulzari Lal Nanda (1898-1997) (Acting) |
27 May 1964-9 June 1964 |
Lal Bahadur Shastri (1904-1966) |
09 June 1964-11 January 1966 |
Gulzari Lal Nanda (1898-1997) (Acting) |
11 January 1966-24 January 1966 |
Indira Gandhi (1917-1984) |
24 January1966-24 March 1977 |
Morarji Desai (1896-1995) |
24 March 1977-28 July 1979 |
Charan Singh (1902-1987) |
28 July 1979-14 January 1980 |
Indira Gandhi (1917-1984) |
14 January 1980-31 October 1984 |
Rajiv Gandhi (1944-1991) |
31 October 1984-1 December 1989 |
Vishwanath Pratap Singh (B-1931) |
02 December 1989-10 November 1990 |
Chandra Shekhar (b-1927) |
10 November 1990-21 June 1991 |
P.V. Narasimha Rao (1921-2004) |
21 June 1991-16 May 1996 |
Atal Bihari Vajpayee (b-1926) |
16 May 1996-01 June 1996 |
H.D. Deve Gowda (B-1933) |
01 June 1996-21 April 1997 |
I.K. Gujral (b-1933) |
21 April 1997-18 March 1998 |
Atal Bihari Vajpayee (B-1926) |
19 March 1998 -13 October 1999 |
Atal Bihari Vajpayee (B-1926) |
13 October 1999 - 22 May 2004 |
Dr. Manmohan Singh |
22 May 2004 – Incumbent |